Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-930
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-930
Title:CIC Services, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Internal Revenue Service, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2020
Linked with 19A440
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5019)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Application (19A440) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2019 to January 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Application (19A440) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 3, 2020.
Dec 13 2019Application (19A440) to extend further the time from January 3, 2020 to January 17, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Application (19A440) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 17, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of Tax Clinic at the Legal Services Center of Harvard Law School filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2020 to March 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Patrick J. Smith filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Kristin E. Hickman filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky Captive Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020Brief of respondent Internal Revenue Service in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 03 2020Reply of petitioner CIC Services, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
May 04 2020Petition GRANTED.
May 18 2020Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 28 2020Joint motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 15, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 8, 2020.
May 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, CIC Services, LLC
Blanket Consent
Jul 06 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner CIC Services, LLC.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 14 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Taxpayer Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2020Brief of petitioner CIC Services, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Patrick J. Smith filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 22 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Free Speech (7/31/2020).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Amicus brief of Institute for Free Speech not accepted for filing. (July 28, 2020 - Corrected version submitted).
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of Kristin E. Hickman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Brief amici curiae of Alabama Captive Insurance Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020Amicus brief of Partnership for Conservation not accepted for filing. (July 31, 2020 - Corrected version submitted)
Jul 22 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Partnership for Conservation (7/31/2020).
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Aug 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Bryan T. Camp filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 08 2020Brief of respondent Internal Revenue Service filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 11 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Institute for Free Speech GRANTED.
Sep 11 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Partnership for Conservation GRANTED.
Sep 15 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Government Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 1, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Oct 08 2020Reply of petitioner CIC Services, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2020The record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit has been electronically filed.
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
617-227-0548
Party name: CIC Services, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Internal Revenue Service
Other
Bryan Thomas Camp
    Counsel of Record
4412 14th Street
Lubbock, TX 79416

bryan.camp@ttu.edu
8068348606
Party name: Professor Bryan T. Camp
Allen Joseph Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Free Speech
1150 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 801
Washington, DC 20036

adickerson@ifs.org
(202) 301-9000
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Nicole Maria Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight, LLP
800 17th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

nicole.elliott@hklaw.com
202-469-5144
Party name: Partnership for Conservation
David William Foster
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

david.foster@skadden.com
202-371-7626
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel
K. Scott Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
Dickinson Wright, PLLC
500 Woodward Ave.
Suite 4000
Detroit, MI 48226

khamilton@dickinsonwright.com
313 223 3041
Party name: Kentucky Captive Association, Inc., et al.
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W. #650
Washington, DC 20001

jdhenchman@gmail.com
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Kristin E. Hickman
    Counsel of Record
Univsersity of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55455

khickman@umn.edu
6126242915
Party name: Kristin E. Hickman
Joseph Brant Judkins
    Counsel of Record
Baker & McKenzie LLP
815 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

joseph.judkins@bakermckenzie.com
703-307-1219
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center et al.
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
202-879-7658
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Carlton M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Tax Clinic at the Legal Services Center of Harvard law School
122 Boylston Street
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130

csmith@law.harvard.edu
6173902532
Party name: Tax Clinic at the Legal Services Center of Harvard Law School
Carlton M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Tax Clinic at the Legal Services Center of Harvard Law School
122 Boylston Street
Jamaica Plain, MA 02130

csmith@law.harvard.edu
6173902532
Party name: Center for Taxpayer Rights
Patrick J. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Ivins, Phillips & Barker
1717 K Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

psmith@ipbtax.com
202-662-3415
Party name: Patrick J. Smith
Jonathan Ellis Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

jon@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Former Government Officials
Russel James Valvo III
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jvalvo@afphq.org
5713294420
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543