Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-903
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-903
Title:Michael Ramon Ochoa, Petitioner
v.
Arthur Levine, et al.
Docketed:January 23, 2020
Lower Ct:Superior Court of Pennsylvania, Pittsburgh Office
   Case Numbers:(327 WDA 2019)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 9, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 16, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Ramon Ochoa58 West Portal Avenue#218
San Francisco, CA 94127

(415) 373-2172
Party name: Michael R. Ochoa

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543