Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-899
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-899
Title:Shaniz West, Petitioner
v.
Doug Winfield, et al.
Docketed:January 21, 2020
Linked with 19A565
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35300)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2019Application (19A565) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 3, 2019 to February 1, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 19 2019Application (19A565) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 1, 2020.
Jan 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.
Feb 20 2020Brief amici curiae of DKT Liberty Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief of Doug Winfield, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (March 23, 2020)
Mar 20 2020Brief of respondents Doug Winfield, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2020Reply of petitioner Shaniz West filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 20 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Shaniz West
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

rsimpson@wileyrein.com
202-719-7314
Party name: Doug Winfield, et al.
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: DKT Liberty Project, et al.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: Legal Scholars
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543