Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-897
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-897
Title:Tae D. Johnson, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al., Petitioners
v.
Maria Angelica Guzman Chavez, et al.
Docketed:January 21, 2020
Linked with 19A723
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6086, 18-6419)
   Decision Date:October 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2019Application (19A723) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2019 to February 7, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Dec 30 2019Application (19A723) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 7, 2020.
Jan 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2020)
Petition
Jan 17 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Feb 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020.
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2020 to April 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 22, 2020.
Apr 22 2020Brief of respondents Maria Angelica Guzman Chavez, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
May 08 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 12, 2020 to May 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 08 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 19, 2020, granted.
May 14 2020Reply of petitioners Albence, Dir. of U.S. Immigration, et al. filed.
Main Document
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020Petition GRANTED.
Jun 15 2020As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jul 22 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 14, 2020.
Aug 14 2020Brief of petitioners Mattew T. Albence, Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Albence, Dir. of U.S. Immigration, et al.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2020Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including November 4, 2020.
Oct 05 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Nov 04 2020Brief of respondents Maria Angelica Guzman Chavez, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Liberties Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Brief amici curiae of National Immigration Litigation Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Human Rights First and International Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Former United States Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Amicus brief of American Immigration Council, et al. not accepted for filing. (December 21, 2020 - Corrected version submitted)
Nov 12 2020Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Council, et al. filed (Dec.15, 2020). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 11, 2021.
Dec 03 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Dec 04 2020Reply of petitioners Tony H. Pham, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020CIRCULATED
Dec 29 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit. The record is electronic.
Jan 11 2021Argued. For petitioners: Vivek Suri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Paul W. Hughes, Washington, D. C.
Jun 29 2021Judgment REVERSED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, except as to footnote 4. Roberts, C. J., and Kavanaugh and Barrett, JJ., joined that opinion in full. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring except for footnote 4 and concurring in the judgment, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor and Kagan, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. PrelogarActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Tae D. Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul W. HughesMcDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-1531

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Maria Angelica Guzman Chavez, et al.
Other
Maureen Patricia Alger
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3175 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304

malger@cooley.com
6508435201
Party name: American Immigration Council, et al.
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: National Immigration Litigation Alliance, et al.
Eugene Martin Gelernter
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Amer.icas
New York, NY 10036

emgelernter@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Human Rights First and International Law Scholars
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Nicole C. Henning
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
77 W Wacker Drive
Suite 3500
Chicago, IL 60601

nhenning@jonesday.com
3127823939
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center
David G. Keyko
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

david.keyko@pillsburylaw.com
212-858-1064
Party name: Former United States Immigration Judges and Members of the Board of Immigration Appeals
Michael King Thomas Tan
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad St., 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

mtan@aclu.org
212-519-7848
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543