Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8850 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8850 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Billy Joe Wardlow, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:July 7, 2020
Linked with 19A1069
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-70012)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 6, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Application (19A1069) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Brief of respondent Lorie Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Application (19A1069) referred to the Court.
Jul 08 2020Application (19A1069) denied by the Court.
Jul 08 2020Petition DENIED.
Jul 08 2020Reply of petitioner Billy Joe Wardlow filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard H. Burr III
    Counsel of Record
Burr and Welch, PC
PO Box 525
Leggett, TX 77350

dick.burrandwelch@gmail.com
713-628-3391
Party name: Billy Joe Wardlow
Attorneys for Respondent
Gwendolyn Suzanne Vindell
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701

gwendolyn.vindell2@oag.texas.gov
5124753448
Party name: Lorie Davis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543