Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8844
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8844
Title:Louis A. Piccone, Petitioner
v.
United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:June 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1471)
   Decision Date:November 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 09 2020Waiver of right of respondent Patent and Trademark Office to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Louis A. Piccone593 McGill Street
Hawkesbury, Canada, XX K6A-1R1

613-632-4798
Party name: Louis A. Piccone
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Patent and Trademark Office

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543