Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8750
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8750
Title:Lakshmi Arunachalam, Petitioner
v.
SAP America, Inc.
Docketed:June 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1794)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 20, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam). The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion and this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lakshmi Arunachalam222 Stanford Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025

(650) 690-0995
Party name: Lakshmi Arunachalam

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543