Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8712 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8712 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Vide 19-8835
Title:Billy Joe Wardlow, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:June 15, 2020
Linked with 19A1064
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-58,548-02)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Jun 19 2020Brief amici curiae of Professional Organizations, Practitioners, and Academics in the Fields of Neuroscience, Neuropsychology, and Other Related Fields filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Application (19A1064) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2020Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2020Reply of petitioner Billy Joe Wardlow filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 08 2020Application (19A1064) referred to the Court.
Jul 08 2020Petition DENIED.
Jul 08 2020Application (19A1064) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard H. Burr III
    Counsel of Record
Burr and Welch, PC
PO Box 525
Leggett, TX 77350

dick.burrandwelch@gmail.com
713-628-3391
Party name: Billy Joe Wardlow
Attorneys for Respondent
Gwendolyn Suzanne Vindell
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701

gwendolyn.vindell2@oag.texas.gov
5124753448
Party name: State of Texas
Other
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Professional Organizations, Practitioners, and Academics in the Fields of Neuroscience, Neuropsychology, and Other Related Fields

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543