Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8709
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8709
Title:Gregory Greer, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-12963)
   Decision Date:January 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 08 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 10 2020Response Requested. (Due September 9, 2020)
Aug 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 9, 2020 to October 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2020.
Oct 09 2020Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 03 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 04 2020Rescheduled.
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 06 2021Reply of petitioner Gregory Greer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Feb 22 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Feb 22 2021Brief of petitioner Gregory Greer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Motion file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioner Gregory Greer.
Main DocumentMain Document
Mar 01 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gregory Greer
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 20, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 15 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 19 2021Record from the U.S.D.C. Middle District of Florida Jacksonville Division has been electronically received and filed.
Mar 24 2021Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2021Motion of petitioner for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Apr 09 2021Reply of petitioner Gregory Greer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2021Argued. For petitioner: M. Allison Guagliardo, Assistant Federal Defender, Tampa, Fla. For respondent: Benjamin W. Snyder, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C..
Jun 14 2021Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Breyer, Alito, Kagan, Gorsuch and Barrett, JJ., joined. Justice Sotomayor, concurring as to No. 19-8709, and concurring in part, dissenting in part, and dissenting from the judgment as to No. 20-444. (Opinion also for No. 20-444). VIDED.
Jul 16 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meghan Collins
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
201 S. Orange Avenue
Suite 300
Orlando, FL 32801

Meghan_boyle@fd.org
407-648-6338
Party name: Gregory Greer
Mara Allison GuagliardoOffice of the Federal Defender-Middle District of Florida
400 N. Tampa Street, Suite 2700
Tampa, FL 33602

allison_guagliardo@fd.org
813-514-4685
Party name: Gregory Greer
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Clifford Warren Berlow
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

cberlow@jenner.com
312-840-7366
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543