Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8684
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8684
Title:Brian David Hill, Petitioner
v.
United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Docketed:June 12, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2338)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 13, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 16 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 06 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Brian David Hill.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian David Hill310 Forest Street
Apt. 2
Martinsville, VA 24112

276-790-3505
Party name: Brian David Hill
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543