Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-864
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-864
Title:Bradley Beers, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2020
Linked with 19A582
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3010)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 11, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2019Application (19A582) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2019 to February 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Application (19A582) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 9, 2020.
Jan 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2020.
Mar 05 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2020 to April 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2020.
Apr 03 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Bradley Beers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2020Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 27 2020Reply of petitioner Bradley Beers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED with instructions to dismiss the case as moot. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950).
Jun 19 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Bradley Beers
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543