Docket for 19-859
|
Nov 06 2019 | Application (19A499) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2019 to January 11, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 14 2019 | Application (19A499) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until January 13, 2020. | | | Jan 02 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 10, 2020 to March 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 24 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2020. | | | Mar 24 2020 | Brief of respondent Facebook, Inc. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 03 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 8, 2020 to April 22, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 06 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until April 22, 2020, granted. | | | Apr 20 2020 | Reply of petitioners Stuart Force, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 18 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|