Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8538
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8538
Title:Jeffrey W. Smiles, Petitioner
v.
Berks County, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:May 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1622)
   Decision Date:October 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 25, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 25 2020Brief of respondents Berks County, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 25 2020Reply of petitioner Smiles Jeffrey W. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.
Oct 30 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey W. Smiles3049 Octagon Ave.
Sinking Springs, PA 19608

610 678 0254
Party name: Smiles Jeffrey W.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Bradley Adair
    Counsel of Record
Deasey, Mahoney & Valentini, Ltd.
103 Chesley Drive
Suite 101
Media, PA 19063

aadair@dmvlawfirm.com
610-892-2732
Party name: Berks County, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543