Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-843
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-843
Title:Daniel K. Holtzclaw, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:January 6, 2020
Linked with 19A442
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2016-62)
   Decision Date:August 1, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2019Application (19A442) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2019 to December 29, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Application (19A442) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 29, 2019.
Dec 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James L. Hankins
    Counsel of Record
Timberbrooke Business Center
929 NW 164th Street
Edmond, OK 73013

jameshankins@ocdw.com
405-753-4150
Party name: Daniel K. Holtzclaw

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543