Docket for 19-835
|
Nov 12 2019 | Application (19A546) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2019 (Nos. 16-1055, 17-1047, 17-1051, 17-1259 & 18-1029) and December 5, 2019 (No. 18-1027) to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 19 2019 | Application (19A546) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 30, 2019. | | | Dec 30 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 24 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent American Petroleum Institute to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Growth Energy to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2020 | Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent National Biodiesel Board to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Monroe Energy, LLC to respond filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 30 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2020. | | | Feb 03 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Home Builders of the United States. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 26 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 27 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2020. | | | Apr 03 2020 | Brief of respondent Environmental Protection Agency in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Apr 20 2020 | Reply of petitioners Valero Energy Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 22 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020. | | | May 18 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Home Builders of the United States GRANTED. | | | May 18 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|