Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-832
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-832
Title:Apple Inc., Petitioner
v.
VirnetX Inc., et al.
Docketed:December 31, 2019
Linked with 19A427
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1197)
   Decision Date:January 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2019Application (19A427) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2019 to December 29, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 18 2019Application (19A427) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 29, 2019.
Oct 18 2019Opposition to Application for Extension of Time of VirnetX Inc., et al. received.
Main DocumentOtherOther
Dec 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2020Waiver of right of respondent VirnetX Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 14 2020Response Requested. (Due February 13, 2020)
Jan 21 2020Brief of respondents VirnetX Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Apple Inc.
Blanket Consent
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of The R Street Institute, the Electronic Frontier Foundation, and Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 04 2020Reply of petitioner Apple Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of ACT | The App Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 13 2020Brief amici curiae of High Tech Inventors Alliance, HP Inc., and Lenovo (United States) Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Apple Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: VirnetX Inc., et al.
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: The R Street Institute, the Electronic Frontier Foundation, and Engine Advocacy
Courtney Gilligan Saleski
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP
1650 Market Street
Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19103

courtney.saleski@dlapiper.com
215-656-2431
Party name: High Tech Inventors Alliance, HP Inc., and Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Brian Eugene Scarpelli
    Counsel of Record
ACT The App Association
1401 K Street NW, Suite 501
Washington, DC 20005

bscarpelli@actonline.org
+1 5175071446
Party name: ACT | The App Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543