Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-831
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-831
Title:Adam Jarchow, et al., Petitioners
v.
State Bar of Wisconsin, et al.
Docketed:January 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3444)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2020.
Jan 29 2020Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers United Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center & Mackinac Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2020Brief amici curiae of State Public Policy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2020.
Apr 03 2020Brief of respondents State Bar of Wisconsin, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2020Reply of petitioners Adam Jarchow, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, with whom Justice Gorsuch joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David B. Rivkin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

drivkin@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1731
Party name: Adam Jarchow, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Roberta Florence Howell
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
150 E. Gilman Street
Madison, WI 53703

rhowell@foley.com
608-257-5035
Party name: State Bar of Wisconsin, et al.
Other
Joseph Robert Giannini
    Counsel of Record
12016 Wilshire Blvd.
#5
Los Angeles, CA 90025

j.r.giannini@verizon.net
3108041814
Party name: Lawyers United Inc.
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: State Public Policy Organizations
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-263-7668
Party name: Liberty Justice Center & Mackinac Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543