SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-8229 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-8229 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Donnie L. Harris, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:
April 9, 2020
Linked with 19A830
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
Case Numbers:
(D-2014-153)
Decision Date:
September 26, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
November 4, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2020
Application (19A830) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 2, 2020 to April 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jan 27 2020
Application (19A830) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 2, 2020.
Mar 24 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 11, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 04 2020
Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 03 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 22 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kristi L. Christopher
Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Indigent Defense System
P.O. Box 926
Norman, OK 73170
kristi.christopher@oids.ok.gov
(405) 801-2770
Party name: Donnie L. Harris, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##