Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-820
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-820
Title:John McMahon, in His Official Capacity as Sheriff of San Bernadino County, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chemehuevi Indian Tribe, et al.
Docketed:December 31, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56791)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 23 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2020Brief of respondents Chemehuevi Indian Tribe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2020Reply of petitioners John McMahon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: John McMahon, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lester John Marston
    Counsel of Record
Rapport and Marston
405 West Perkins Street
Ukiah, CA 95482

marston1@pacbell.net
7074626846
Party name: Chemehuevi Indian Tribe, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543