Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-814
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-814
Title:Tony Deshawn McCoy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 27, 2019
Linked with 19A514
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4731)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2019Application (19A514) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 24, 2019 to December 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Nov 12 2019Application (19A514) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 26, 2019.
Dec 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2020.
Jan 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2020 to March 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 27, 2020.
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to May 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2020.
May 14 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from June 2, 2020 to June 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until June 9, 2020, granted.
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 09 2020Reply of petitioner Tony Deshawn McCoy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Tony Deshawn McCoy
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
John Wesley Hall Jr.
    Counsel of Record
1202 Main St.
Suite 210
Little Rock, AR 72202

forhall@aol.com
501-371-9131
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543