Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8126
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8126
Title:Garry Wayne Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:March 27, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2019-670)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
May 20 2020Response Requested. (Due June 19, 2020)
Jun 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2020 to July 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 20, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
Jul 20 2020Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of McGirt v. Oklahoma, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).
Nov 06 2020MANDATE ISSUED.
Nov 06 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Garry Wayne Wilson779304
216 North Murray St.
Helena, OK 73741

Party name: Garry Wayne Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543