Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8105 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8105 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Justin Anderson, Petitioner
v.
Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Division of Correction
Docketed:March 26, 2020
Linked with 19A789
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2456)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2020Application (19A789) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2020 to March 23, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Application (19A789) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 23, 2020.
Mar 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2020 to May 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2020.
Apr 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Organization on Fetal Alcohol Syndrome filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 27, 2020 to June 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 26, 2020.
Jun 26 2020Brief of respondent Dexter Payne in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 02 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from July 16, 2020 to July 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 06 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until July 23, 2020, granted.
Jul 21 2020Reply of petitioner Justin Anderson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Charles Williams
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1401 West Capitol, Suite 490
Little Rock, AR 72201

john_c_williams@fd.org
501.324.6132
Party name: Justin Anderson
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72223

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Dexter Payne
Other
Lisa B. Pensabene
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

lpensabene@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: National Organization on Fetal Alcohol Syndrome

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543