Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8029
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8029
Title:Lakshmi Arunachalam, Petitioner
v.
Lyft, Inc.
Docketed:March 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-40597)
   Decision Date:December 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 17, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion and this petition.
May 20 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lakshmi Arunachalam222 Stanford Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025

(650) 690-0995
Party name: Lakshmi Arunachalam

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543