Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-8011 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-8011 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Anderson Dellinger, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:March 16, 2020
Linked with 19A497
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Eastern Division
   Case Numbers:(E2018-00135-CCA-R3-ECN)
   Decision Date:April 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 14, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2019Application (19A497) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 12, 2019 to January 11, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 06 2019Application (19A497) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 13, 2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Apr 14 2020Brief of respondent State of Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOther
Apr 27 2020Reply of petitioner James Dellinger filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020Petition DENIED.
Jun 01 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amy Dawn Harwell
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender TNM
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

Amy_Harwell@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: James Dellinger
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Anthony Ball
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
301 6th Avenue North
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

ben.ball@ag.tn.gov
615-741-7859
Party name: State of Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543