Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-801
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-801
Title:Eddie N. Dela Cruz, Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:December 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2101)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2020)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2020Waiver of right of respondent Wilkie, Robert to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth Alain Watkins
    Counsel of Record
WATKINS LAW & ADVOCACY, PLLC
1455 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20004

watkins@wlapllc.com
202-355-9421
Party name: Eddie Dela Cruz
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilkie, Robert

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543