Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-795
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-795
Title:Paul D. Voorhees, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 20, 2019
Linked with 19A441
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(18-0372)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2019Application (19A441) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2019 to December 23, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Application (19A441) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 23, 2019.
Dec 20 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2020.
Feb 20 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 05 2020Reply of petitioner Paul Voorhees filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald G. Rehkopf Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Donald G. Rehkopf, Jr.
2nd Floor
31 East Main Street
Rochester, NY 14614

usmilitarylaw@gmail.com
(585) 434-0232
Party name: Paul Voorhees
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543