Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-789
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-789
Title:Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A., et al., Petitioners
v.
John Paul DeJoria
Docketed:December 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50348)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 17, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Waiver of right of respondent John Paul DeJoria to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 06 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 10 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, John Paul DeJoria
Blanket Consent
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Jan 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Miriem Bensalah-Chaqroun and Othman Benjelloun filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2020Response Requested. (Due February 24, 2020)
Feb 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 24, 2020 to March 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 25, 2020.
Mar 25 2020Brief of respondent John Paul DeJoria in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020Reply of petitioners Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Geoffrey Lloyd Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100
Houston, TX 77002

gharrison@susmangodfrey.com
713-651-9366
Party name: Maghreb Petroleum Exploration, S.A., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: John Paul DeJoria
Other
Thomas Wolf
    Counsel of Record
Miles & Stockbridge
919 E. Main Street
Suite 1100
Richmond, VA 23219

twolf@milesstockbridge.com
8049056910
Party name: Miriem Bensalah-Chaqroun and Othman Benjelloun

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543