Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7810 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7810 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Dale W. Eaton, Petitioner
v.
Mike Pacheco, Warden
Docketed:February 27, 2020
Linked with 19A678
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-8013, 16-8086)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2019Application (19A678) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2019 to February 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 16 2019Response to application from respondent filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2019Application (19A678) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 24, 2020.
Dec 26 2019Reply of applicant received.
Reply
Feb 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 30, 2020)
AppendixPetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Mar 30 2020Brief of respondent Mike Pacheco, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Reply of petitioner Dale Eaton filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
Apr 27 2020Rescheduled.
May 11 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 18 2020Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean D. O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
4920 N. Askew
Kansas City, MO 64119

obriensd@umkc.edu
8162366152
Party name: Dale Eaton
Attorneys for Respondent
Jenny Lynn Craig
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Wyoming Attorney General
123 Capitol Building
Cheyenne, WY 82002

jenny.craig1@wyo.gov
307-777-7977
Party name: Mike Pacheco

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543