Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7790
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7790
Title:Brenda Mason, Individually and on Behalf of Quamaine Dwayne Mason, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Martin Faul
Docketed:February 26, 2020
Linked with 19A401
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-30362)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2019Application (19A401) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 15, 2019 to November 29, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Application (19A401) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 14, 2019.
Nov 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 27, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Brief of respondent Martin Faul in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 20 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffery Ferral Speer
    Counsel of Record
Doucet Speer, APLC
617 St. John Street
P.O. Box 4303
Lafayette, LA 70501

jeffspeer@doucetspeer.com
3372909097
Party name: Brenda Mason, et vir
Brenda MasonP.O. Box 57342
Webster, TX 77598

(337) 258-8607
Party name: Brenda Mason, et vir
Attorneys for Respondent
Joy Cantrelle Rabalais
    Counsel of Record
Borne, Wilkes and Rabalais, LLC
200 West Congress Street
Suite 1000
Lafayette, LA 70501

rabalais@bornewilkes.com
337-232-1604
Party name: Martin Faul

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543