Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7745 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7745 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Willie B. Smith, III, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections
Docketed:February 24, 2020
Linked with 19A513
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15043)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 23, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2019Application (19A513) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 22, 2019 to February 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 12 2019Application (19A513) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 20, 2020.
Feb 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 25, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2020.
Apr 24 2020Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 01 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 13, 2020 to May 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 04 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 27, 2020, granted.
May 26 2020Reply of petitioner Willie B. Smith, III filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 08 2020Rescheduled.
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Joseph Horowitz
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

shorowitz@sidley.com
312-853-7143
Party name: Willie B. Smith, III
Attorneys for Respondent
Henry Mitchell Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Atty General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

henry.johnson@alabamaag.gov
334-353-9095
Party name: State of Alabama

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543