Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-760
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-760
Title:Donald J. Trump, et al., Petitioners
v.
Deutsche Bank AG, et al.
Docketed:December 13, 2019
Linked with 19A640
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1540)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2019Application (19A640) to recall and stay mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2019UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, case No. 19-1540, issued December 3, 2019, is hereby recalled and stayed until 5 p.m. on December 13, 2019. It is further ordered that a response be filed on or before December 11, 2019, by 11 a.m.
Dec 11 2019Response to application from respondents Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House of Representatives, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2019Reply of applicants Trump, Donald J., et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Dec 13 2019Application (19A640) referred to the Court.
Dec 13 2019Application (19A640) granted by the Court.
Dec 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed.
Dec 13 2019The application (19A640) for stay presented to Justice Ginsburg and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, case No. 19-1540, is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. In addition, the application is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari, and the petition is granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-715 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The cases will be set for argument in the March 2020 argument session.
Dec 13 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-715 is granted. The application (19A640) for stay presented to Justice Ginsburg and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, case No. 19-1540, is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. In addition, the application is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari, and the petition is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The cases will be set for argument in the March 2020 argument session. VIDED.
Dec 13 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-715. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-715. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” (December 16, 2019).
Jan 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 31, 2020. VIDED
Feb 19 2020CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Feb 19 2020The record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit has been electronically filed.
Feb 20 2020Sealed documents sent from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit are electronically filed.
Mar 16 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED. VIDED.
Mar 27 2020Reply of Donald J. Trump, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
(207) 522-3163
Party name: Donald J. Trump, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
(202) 225-9700
Party name: Committee on Financial Services of the U.S. House Representatives; Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatiives
James Alwin Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Murphy & McGonigle, P.C.
1185 Avenue of the Americas
21st Floor
New York, NY 10036

jmurphy@mmlawus.com
2128803968
Party name: Capital One Financial Corporation
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Andrew J. Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Foster Garvey P.C.
100 Wall Street, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10005

andrew.goodman@foster.com
(212) 431-8700
Party name: Center for Media and Democracy and Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Andre Michel Mura
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs Law Group LLP
505 14th Street
Suite 1110
Oakland, CA 94612

amm@classlawgroup.com
5103509717
Party name: Bipartisan Former Members of Congress
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

zack.tripp@weil.com
202-682-7000
Party name: Separation-of-Powers Law Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543