Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7572 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7572 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Abel Revilla Ochoa, Petitioner
v.
Bryan Collier, Executive Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, et al.
Docketed:February 5, 2020
Linked with 19A876
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-70001)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 6, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetitionAppendixOther
Feb 05 2020Application (19A876) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2020Brief of respondent Bryan Collier, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2020Application (19A876) referred to the Court.
Feb 06 2020Reply of petitioner Abel Ochoa filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 06 2020Application (19A876) denied by the Court.
Feb 06 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Don Schepers
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender. Northem District of Texas
525 S. Griffin St., Ste. 629
Dallas, TX 75202

jeremy_schepers@fd.org
12147672746
Party name: Abel Ochoa
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Matthew Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711

stephen.hoffman@oag.texas.gov
5129366388
Party name: Bryan Collier, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543