Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-756
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-756
Title:Louis Taylor, Petitioner
v.
Pima County, Arizona, et al.
Docketed:December 12, 2019
Linked with 19A464
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16980)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 14, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2019Application (19A464) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 12, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Application (19A464) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Louis Taylor.
Blanket Consent
Dec 31 2019Motion of Pima County to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2020 to February 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 31 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, County of Pima.
Blanket ConsentBlanket Consent
Jan 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2020.
Jan 07 2020Motion City of Tucson to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2020 to February 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Tucson.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2020, for all respondents.
Jan 09 2020Brief amicus curiae of Lucian E. Dervan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Brief of respondent County of Pima in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2020Letter of February 12, 2020 from counsel for respondent City of Tucson, AZ submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Feb 26 2020Reply of petitioner Louis Taylor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Louis Taylor
Attorneys for Respondents
Nancy Jane Davis
    Counsel of Record
Pima County Attorney's Office
32 N. Stone
Suite 2100
Tucson, AZ 85701

nancy.davis@pcao.pima.gov
5207244070
Party name: County of Pima
Dennis Patrick McLaughlin
    Counsel of Record
City of Tucson Attorney's Office
P.O. Box 27210
Tucson, AZ 85726

Dennis.McLaughlin@tucsonaz.gov
520-791-4221
Party name: City of Tucson
Other
David Joseph Euchner
    Counsel of Record
33 N. Stone Avenue
Suite 2100
Tucson, AZ 85701

david.euchner@pima.gov
520-724-9107
Party name: Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Judy Perry Martinez
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Joseph Victor Schaeffer
    Counsel of Record
Spilman Thomas & Battle, PLLC
48 Donley St., Suite 800
Morgantown, WV 26501

jschaeffer@spilmanlaw.com
304-291-7952
Party name: National Bar Association
Charles A Trost
    Counsel of Record
Belmont University
1900 Belmont Blvd
Nashville, TN 37212

charlie.trost@belmont.edu
615-460-8299
Party name: Lucian E. Dervan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543