Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7544
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7544
Title:Robert M. Waggy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 4, 2020
Linked with 19A581
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-30171)
   Decision Date:September 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2019Application (19A581) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 4, 2019 to February 2, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Application (19A581) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 2, 2020.
Feb 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 5, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2020 to April 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 6, 2020.
Mar 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of The National Coalition Against Censorship filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania Center for the First Amendment and Eugene Volokh filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 6, 2020.
Apr 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2020 to May 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2020.
May 14 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 03 2020Reply of petitioner Robert M. Waggy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of the Virgin Islands
1336 Beltjen Rd
Suite 202
Saint Thomas, VI 00802

matt_campbell@fd.org
3407744449
Party name: Robert M. Waggy
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lisa Suzanne Hoppenjans
    Counsel of Record
Washington University School of Law Clinical Education Program
Campus Box 1120, 1 Brookings Drive
St. Louis, MO 63105

lhoppenjans@wustl.edu
3149358980
Party name: The National Coalition Against Censorship
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Dr. E
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Pennsylvania Center for the First Amendment and Eugene Volokh

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543