Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7529
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7529
Title:Veronica A. Williams, Petitioner
v.
Litton Loan Services, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1032)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 4, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 21 2020Waiver of right of respondents Litton Loan Servicing, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020.
Apr 06 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Veronica A. Williams541 Scotland Road
South Orange, NJ 07079-3009

(202) 486-4565
Party name: Veronica A. Williams
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert L. Byer
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
600 Grant ST
Suite 5010
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

rlbyer@duanemorris.com
4124971083
Party name: Litton Loan Servicing, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543