Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7487
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7487
Title:Jonathan Blades, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 29, 2020
Linked with 19A654
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(15-CF-663)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2019Application (19A654) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 30, 2019 to January 29, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 11 2019Application (19A654) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 29, 2020.
Jan 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 28, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2020 to March 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 30, 2020.
Feb 27 2020Brief amici curiae of Law Professors Susan Herman, Raleigh Hannah Levine, Justin Murray, and Jocelyn Simonson filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2020Brief amicus curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2020.
Apr 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2020 to May 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 27, 2020.
May 27 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 10 2020Reply of petitioner Jonathan Blades filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 29 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Samia Fam
    Counsel of Record
Public Defender Service
633 Indiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

sfam@pdsdc.org
2026281200
Party name: Jonathan Blades
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th St., NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Dr. E
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Law Professors Susan Herman, Raleigh Hannah Levine, Justin Murray, and Jocelyn Simonson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543