Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-748
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-748
Title:John B. Lepore, Petitioner
v.
Office of Personnel Management
Docketed:December 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1474)
   Decision Date:January 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Waiver of right of respondent Office of Personnel Management to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Norman H. Jackman
    Counsel of Record
Jackman and Roth LLP
950 Massachusetts Avenue, Suite 318
Cambridge,, MA 02139

norman.jackman@gmail.com
617-682-8049
Party name: John Lepore
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Office of Personnel Management

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543