Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-7320
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-7320
Title:Jurden Rogers, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15152)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 18 2020Response Requested. (Due March 19, 2020)
Apr 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2020.
May 01 2020Brief of respondent Solicitor General of the United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
May 23 2020Reply of petitioner Jurden Rogers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark A Reyes
    Counsel of Record
Howard & Reyes. Chartered
700 W. 1st Street
Sanford, FL 32771

mark@howardreyeslaw.com
4073146902
Party name: Jurden Rogers
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Solicitor General of the United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543