Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-730
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-730
Title:DeRay McKesson, Petitioner
v.
John Doe
Docketed:December 10, 2019
Linked with 19A458
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30864)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2019Application (19A458) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 25 2019Application (19A458) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 6, 2019.
Dec 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Police Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 46.2 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton, LLP
109 South Fifth Street
Suite 4201
Brooklyn, NY 11249

david@donahuegoldberg.com
2123348813
Party name: DeRay McKesson
Other
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
8122322434
Party name: National Police Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543