Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-719
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-719
Vide 19-641
Title:Dami Hospitality, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Workers' Compensation
Docketed:December 6, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(17SC200)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Brief of respondents Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Workers' Compensation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Dami Hospitality, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
7205086548
Party name: Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Workers' Compensation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543