Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-718
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-718
Title:James King, Petitioner
v.
Douglas Brownback, et al.
Docketed:December 6, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2101)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 28, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 6, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2020 to January 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 21, 2020.
Jan 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2020 to February 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 11, 2020.
Feb 11 2020Brief of respondents Brownback, Douglas, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 21 2020Reply of petitioner James King filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020.
Mar 30 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: James King
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Brownback, Douglas, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543