Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-706
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-706
Title:Facebook, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Nimesh Patel, et al.
Docketed:December 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15982)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 02 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2019Waiver of right of respondent Nimesh Patel, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Data Industry Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ryan David Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Edelson PC
350 North Lasalle. Suite*1400
Chicago, IL 60654

randrews@edelson.com
312-589-6374
Party name: Nimesh Patel, et al.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
202.588.0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Rebecca Everett Kuehn
    Counsel of Record
Hudson Cook, LLP
1909 K Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

rkuehn@hudco.com
2027152008
Party name: Consumer Data Industry Association
Gerard M. Stegmaier
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
1301 K Street, NW
Suite 1000 - East Tower
Washington, DC 20005

gstegmaier@reedsmith.com
(202) 414-9228
Party name: TechFreedom

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543