Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-704
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-704
Title:Matthew D. Wilson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cook County, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:December 3, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2686)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2020 to February 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2020.
Jan 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief of respondents Cook County, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2020Reply of petitioners Matthew D. Wilson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David G. Sigale
    Counsel of Record
Law Firm of David G. Sigale, P.C.
430 West Roosevelt Road
Wheaton, IL 60187

dsigale@sigalelaw.com
16304524547
Party name: Matthew D. Wilson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Megan Scheller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Cook County State's Attorney
500 Richard J. Daley Center Place, 5th Floor
Chicago, IL 60602

jessica.scheller@cookcountyil.gov
(312) 603-6934
Party name: Cook County, et al.
Paul Anthony CastiglioneCook County State
500 Richard J. Daley Center
Chicago, IL 60602

paul.castiglione@cookcountyil.gov
(312) 603-2350
Party name: Cook County, et al.
Other
John Steven Foley
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of J. Steven Foley
11 Pleasant Street, Suite 100
Worcester, MA 01609

jsteven@attorneyfoley.com
508-754-1041
Party name: Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543