Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-70
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-70
Vide 19-110
Title:Larry Householder, et al., Appellants
v.
Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Docketed:July 12, 2019
Linked with 18A1165, 18A1242
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(1:18-cv-357)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2019Application (18A1165) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 13 2019Response to application (18A1165) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Monday, May 20 2019, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
May 20 2019Response to application from respondents Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2019Reply of applicants Larry Householder, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
May 24 2019Application (18A1165) referred to the Court.
May 24 2019Application (18A1165) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, case No. 1:18-CV-00357, entered May 3, 2019, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court or further order of this Court.
May 28 2019Application (18A1242) to extend the time to file a jurisdictional statement on appeal from July 5, 2019 to July 19, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 29 2019Response to application from respondents Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jun 05 2019Application (18A1242) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 19, 2019.
Jul 10 2019Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due August 12, 2019)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Stephen M. Shapiro. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Motion to dismiss filed by appellees Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 14 2019Response to motion to dismiss from appellants Larry Householder, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Aug 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Stephen M. Shapiro GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rucho v. Common Cause, 588 U.S. ___ (2019).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Larry Householder, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Tiffany Alora Thomas
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

athomas@aclu.org
212-519-7866
Party name: Ohio A. Philip Randolph Institute, et al.
Other
Michael Robert Geroe
    Counsel of Record
8049 Paseo Arrayan
Carlsbad, CA 92009

mgeroe@gmail.com
816-721-4814
Party name: Stephen M. Shapiro

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543