Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-694
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-694
Title:Heather Baker, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kyle Baker, Deceased, Petitioner
v.
City of Trenton, Michigan, et al.
Docketed:December 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2181)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Waiver of right of respondent City of Trenton, Michigan, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020.
Feb 24 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Roy Bendure
    Counsel of Record
Bendure & Thomas
15450 E. Jefferson Avenue
Suite 110
Grosse Pointe Park, MI 48230

jhyland123@yahoo.com
313-961-1525
Party name: Heather, Personal Representative of the Estate of Kyle Baker, Deceased Baker
Attorneys for Respondents
Courtney A. JonesKallas & Henk, PC
43902 Woodward Ave., Suite 200
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302

cjones@kallashenk.com
248-335-5450
Party name: City of Trenton, Michigan, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543