Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-676
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-676
Title:Joseph A. Zadeh, et al., Petitioners
v.
Mari Robinson, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Linked with 19A308
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-50518)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2019Application (19A308) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 30, 2019 to October 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Application (19A308) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 30, 2019.
Oct 17 2019Application (19A308) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2019 to November 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 17 2019Application (19A308) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 27, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Waiver of right of respondents Mari Robinson, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2020Response Requested. (Due February 7, 2020)
Jan 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2020 to March 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 9, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 9, 2020 to April 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2020.
Apr 08 2020Brief of respondents Mari Robinson, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 22, 2020 to April 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 21 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari until April 28, 2020, granted.
Apr 27 2020Reply of petitioners Joseph A. Zadeh, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Joseph A. Zadeh, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: Mari Robinson, et al.
Other
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Association of American Physicians and Surgeons
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543