Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-670
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-670
Title:Arnold Fleck, Petitioner
v.
Joe Wetch, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1564)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Arnold Fleck
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Dec 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2019 to February 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2020.
Dec 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Brief amici curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of 1889 Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2020Brief of respondent Petra Mandigo Hulm in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2020Brief of respondents Joe Wetch, Aubrey Fiebelkorn-Zuger, and Tony Weiler in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2020Reply of petitioner Arnold Fleck filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Petition DENIED.
Apr 03 2020Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
May 04 2020Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Arnold Fleck
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Joe Wetch, Aubrey Fiebelkorn-Zuger, and Tony Weiler
James Edward Nicolai
    Counsel of Record
North Dakota Office of Attorney General
600 East Boulevard Avenue, Dept. 125
Bismarck, ND 58505-0400

jnicolai@nd.gov
701-328-3640
Party name: Petra Mandigo Hulm
Other
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Raymond J. LaJeunesse Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22151

rjl@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Warren V. Norred
    Counsel of Record
Norred Law, PLLC
515 E. Border
Arlington, TX 76010

wnorred@norredlaw.com
817-704-3984
Party name: 1889 Institute
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suire 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
4145881658
Party name: Liberty Justice Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543