Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-6602
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-6602
Title:Carey Ackies, aka Boyd, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 13, 2019
Linked with 19A234
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1478)
   Decision Date:March 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 14, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 28 2019Application (19A234) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 12, 2019 to November 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 30 2019Application (19A234) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until November 11, 2019.
Nov 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 13, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 16 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Carey Ackies aka Boyd
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543