Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-6593
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-6593
Title:Deshay D. Ford, Petitioner
v.
Timothy P. White, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55397)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 13, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 26 2019Waiver of right of respondents Timothy P. White, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until February 3, 2020, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Jan 22 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 12 2020Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2020.
May 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020.
Jun 15 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner GRANTED. The order entered January 13, 2020, is vacated.
Jun 15 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deshay D. Ford1409 Halesia Lane
Oxnard, CA 93030

805-827-9987
Party name: Deshay D. Ford
Attorneys for Respondents
Catherine WoodbridgeOffice of the Attorney General
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

catherine.woodbridge@doj.ca.gov
916-210-7526
Party name: Timothy P. White, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543