Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-656
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-656
Title:William Anderson, Petitioner
v.
City of Minneapolis, Minnesota, et al.
Docketed:November 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1941)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2019Waiver of right of respondents County of Hennepin; Hennepin Healthcare System; HCMC; HCMC Ambulance Services/EMS; Hennepin County Medical Examiner's Office; Daniel F. Shively, Mitchel Morey, M.D. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 21 2020Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2020)
Jan 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to March 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2020. See Rule 30.1
Mar 19 2020Brief of respondents City of Minneapolis, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2020Reply of petitioner William Anderson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: William Anderson
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan P. Schmidt
    Counsel of Record
Hennepin County Attorney's Office
C2000 Government Center
300 South Sixth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55487

jon.schmidt@hennepin.us
(612) 543-4588
Party name: City of Minneapolis, Minnesota, et al.
Beth Ann Stack
    Counsel of Record
Hennepin County Attorney's Office
A-2000 Government Center, 300 South Sixth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55487

Beth.Stack@hennepin.us
(612)543-1357
Party name: County of Hennepin; Hennepin Healthcare System; HCMC; HCMC Ambulance Services/EMS; Hennepin County Medical Examiner's Office; Daniel F. Shively, Mitchel Morey, M.D.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543